Charles v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Wade J Charles
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00018
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Strobel on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Strobel, Austin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
February 8, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case was opened as a Southern Division case but it should have been Eastern Division. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-18-BLW (jp)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CV-00018 against Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Group Insurance ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1835063.), filed by Wade J Charles. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - STD, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Arnold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade J Charles
Represented By: James C Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America d/b/a Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Austin Strobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?