Ashby v. Pocatello Hospital, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Ashby
Defendant: Pocatello Hospital, LLC d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC and Pocatello Hospital LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00028
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Carlie E Bacon for Pocatello Hospital LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Carlie E. Bacon. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1863319.)Jennifer A Nelson appearing for Defendant Pocatello Hospital LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Nelson, Jennifer)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 3/28/19, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lisa Ashby, Pocatello Hospital LLC re #4 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/23/2019. (jp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pocatello Hospital LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ardent Health Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate LHP Hospital Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Pocatello Health System, LLC, Other Affiliate LHP Pocatello, LLC, Other Affiliate LHP Operations Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Ardent Legacy Holdings, LLC for Pocatello Hospital LLC.. (Nelson, Jennifer)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Pocatello Hospital LLC.(Nelson, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Ashby. Pocatello Hospital LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Williams, Kimberly)
January 31, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Winmill. Case no longer assigned to Judge Dale. Please use case number 4:19-cv-28-BLW for all future filings. (jp)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pocatello Hospital LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pocatello Hospital, LLC d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1839000.), filed by Lisa Ashby. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Pocatello Hospital, LLC, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashby v. Pocatello Hospital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocatello Hospital, LLC d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocatello Hospital LLC
Represented By: Carlie E Bacon
Represented By: Jennifer A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ashby
Represented By: Kimberly Lynette Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?