Bishop et al v. Hobart Brothers, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rachael Bishop and Nathan Bishop
Defendant: Praxair, Inc., Hobart Brothers, LLC and XYZ Business Entities 1-10
Case Number: 4:2019cv00062
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ralph A Davies for Hobart Brothers, LLC Praxair, Inc re #14 Errata. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall mmediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 ERRATA by Defendants Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc. re #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865109.) . (Williams, Bradley)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Sheffer for Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc re #12 Errata. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 ERRATA by Defendants Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc. re #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Sheffer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865100.) . (Williams, Bradley)
April 16, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Sheffer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865100.) filed by Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc., #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865109.) filed by Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case as the required Application for Pro Hac Vice form was not used. The form is available on our website. The filing party shall re-submit their correct forms using the event of "Errata" located under Other Documents and link to Dkt. 7 & 8 respectively. Using this event will prevent duplicate charges. Please call Carrie at 208-334-9397 with any questions.(cjs)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc.(Williams, Bradley) Modified on 4/16/2019 to edit text to include both filing parties (cjs).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachael Bishop, Nathan Bishop. Hobart Brothers, LLC served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Gabiola, Javier)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachael Bishop, Nathan Bishop. Praxair, Inc. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Gabiola, Javier)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE of Ralph A Davies ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865109.)Bradley J Williams appearing for Defendants Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (Williams, Bradley) Modified on 4/16/2019 (cjs).
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Sheffer. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1865100.)Bradley J Williams appearing for Defendants Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (Williams, Bradley)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc.. (Williams, Bradley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-CV-62-DCN(jp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Praxair, Inc. (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 4/24/2019 and joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hobart Brothers, LLC, Praxair, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Praxair, Inc.)(cjs)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1849603.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hobart Brothers, LLC, #2 Summons Praxair, Inc., #3 Cover Sheet)(Gabiola, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop et al v. Hobart Brothers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Bishop
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Javier L Gabiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Bishop
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Javier L Gabiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Represented By: John Sheffer
Represented By: Bradley J Williams
Represented By: Ralph A Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers, LLC
Represented By: John Sheffer
Represented By: Bradley J Williams
Represented By: Ralph A Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Business Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?