Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Robert Allen Auto Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Defendant: Robert T. Allen, Robert Allen Group, Inc. and Robert Allen Auto Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00067
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER The Stipulations (docket nos. #13 & #14 ) are APPROVED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Parties to Preliminary Injunction; [proposed] Preliminary Injunction by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ellingsen, Mark)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Joint Request to Vacate Hearing and to Enter Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Stipulation of Parties to Preliminary Injunction; [proposed] Preliminary Injunction)(Ellingsen, Mark)
March 11, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #10 Summons Returned Executed filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. It has been re-filed correctly at dkt 11(jp)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Robert Allen Auto Group Inc served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Ellingsen, Mark)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Robert T. Allen served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Ellingsen, Mark)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Ellingsen, Mark)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Jeff Griffin re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #7 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Automotive Wholesale Financing and Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-UCC Filings, #3 Exhibit C-Vehicles Sold Out of Trust as of January 31, 2019, #4 Exhibit D-Vehicles Sold Out of Trust as of March 5, 2019, #5 Exhibit E-Vehicle Collateral as of March 5, 2019, #6 Exhibit F-Dealer Financial Statement)(Ellingsen, Mark)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Mark A Ellingsen appearing for Plaintiff Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Responses due by 3/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit A-Automotive Wholesale Financing Agreement, #3 Exhibit B-UCC Filings, #4 Exhibit C-Vehicles Sold Out of Trust as of January 31, 2019, #5 Exhibit D-Vehicles Sold Out of Trust as of March 5, 2019, #6 Exhibit E-Vehicle Collateral Sold Out of Trust as of March 5, 2019, #7 Exhibit F-Dealer Financial Statement)(Ellingsen, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 3/26/2019 11:00 AM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. NMAC shall serve a copy of this Order, the Verified Complaint and the Summons upon the Defendant not later than ten days prior to the date of the above noted show cause hearing by personal service. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Mark A Ellingsen appearing for Plaintiff Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of NMAC's Motion for Order to Show Cause on NMAC's Second Claim for Relief-Claim and Delivery of Personal Property)(Ellingsen, Mark)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew S Elliott for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert T. Allen, Robert Allen Auto Group Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew Elliott. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1853470.)Mark A Ellingsen appearing for Plaintiff Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Responses due by 3/19/2019 (Ellingsen, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc. for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation.. (Ellingsen, Mark)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Breach of Wholesale Agreement; (2) Claim and Delivery; (3) Injunctive Relief; (4) Specific Performance; & (5) Breach of Guaranty against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1852204.), filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Wholesale Financing and Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-UCC Financing Statements, #3 Exhibit C-Sold Out of Trust Vehicles, #4 Exhibit D-Defendants' Vehicle Collateral as of February 4, 2019, #5 Exhibit E-May 2018 Dealer Financial Statement, #6 Exhibit F-Robert T. Allen Continuing Guaranty Agreement, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to Robert Allen Auto Group, Inc., #9 Summons to Robert Allen)(Ellingsen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Robert Allen Auto Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allen Auto Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Mark A Ellingsen
Represented By: Andrew S Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?