American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. Salmon River Propane, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, as subrogee of Fisher Creek Partners LLC d/b/a Idaho Rocky Mountain Ranch and American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Defendant: Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc. and Salmon River Propane, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00071
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan from the Western District of Washington. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00071-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Salmon River Propane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Salmon River Electric Co-op, Inc. for Salmon River Propane, Inc... (Martin, Byron)
April 16, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (For Salmon River Propane, Inc) (cjs)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, Salmon River Propane, Inc., Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc. re #11 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, #9 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/17/2019. (cjs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 Salmon River Propane, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Salmon River Propane, Inc..(Martin, Byron)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc.. (Thomson, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc..(Thomson, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Pizzica on behalf of American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas (Pizzica, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David B Pizzica for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Pope, William)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. Salmon River Propane Inc. served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Pope, William) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct text to indicate that Salmon River Propane was served on 3/12/19 and regenerate the NEF (Notice of Electronic Filing) (jp).
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Salmon River Propane, Inc., Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc)(cjs)
March 5, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division (Custer County) and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00071-DCN for all future filings. (cjs)
February 26, 2019 RECEIPT: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Fee Received $ 250.00, receipt # 0976-1853125 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David B Pizzica (Receipt 0976-1853125 for $250 paid 2/26/2019). David S Perkins appearing for Plaintiff American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (cjs)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, identifying Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services, Inc. for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Pope, William) Modified on 3/5/2019 to edit party text (cjs).
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Salmon River Propane, Inc., Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1853089.), filed by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Pope, William) Modified on 3/5/2019 to correct parties in text (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. Salmon River Propane, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, as subrogee of Fisher Creek Partners LLC d/b/a Idaho Rocky Mountain Ranch
Represented By: William G Pope
Represented By: William G. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas
Represented By: William G Pope
Represented By: David S Perkins
Represented By: David B Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitehead Landscaping and Snow Removal, Inc.
Represented By: James S Thomson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmon River Propane, Inc.
Represented By: Byron G Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?