Isaksen v. Amy's Kitchen, Inc.

Plaintiff: Scott Isaksen
Defendant: Amy's Kitchen, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/15/2019 10:30 AM MTN. in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. *Mr. Hearn shall serve this Notice, Copy of DOC. 4 to opposing counsel, and place the call. The Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans are now DUE on 5/8/2019.(lc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING Unopposed #5 Motion to Continue. The (1) April 23, 2019 Scheduling Conference, and (2) related April 16, 2019 deadline to submit Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan materials are VACATED. By separate notice, the Court will re-set the Scheduling Conference to take place after May 3, 2019 and, likewise, re-set the related deadline to submit Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan materials. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference Richard A Hearn appearing for Plaintiff Scott Isaksen. Responses due by 4/23/2019 (Hearn, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 10:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. On or before 4/16/19, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott Isaksen. Amy's Kitchen, Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amy's Kitchen, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Amy's Kitchen, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1856336.), filed by Scott Isaksen. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Hearn, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaksen v. Amy's Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Isaksen
Represented By: Bron M Rammell
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy's Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?