United States v. Rencher
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Tamla Rencher
Case Number: 4:2019cv00097
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Respondent Bar M. Davis Concerning Tamla Rencher's Petition to Reject the Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons and to Deny Order to Show Cause, re #3 Answer to Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, #4 Response filed by Tamla Rencher. (jp)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed by United States RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT TAMLA RENCHERS PETITION TO REJECT THE PETITION TO ENFORCE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS AND TO DENY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wucetich, Peter)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Petition to Reject the Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons and to Deny Order to Show Cause, re #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by Tamla Rencher.(jp)
March 29, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cr-00097-BLW (km)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter for consideration by a District Judge. The Magistrate Judge lacks authority to consider the petition absent consent of the parties. 28 U.S.C. 636; 26 U.S.C. 7602, 7604. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Bradley Marler, #4 Cover Sheet)(Wucetich, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Rencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamla Rencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?