Williamson v. Wills et al
Plaintiff: Shaylee Williamson
Defendant: Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Eric Dayley, Paul Gilbert, Brady Barnes, Tom Sellers, Lee Edgley, Kedrick Wills and Ralph Powell
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 7/26/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to State of Idaho and Idaho State Police) Michael J Kane appearing for Defendants Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kane, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Eric Dayley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Lee Edgley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Ralph Powell served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Lee Edgley served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Eric Dayley served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hearn, Richard)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers, Shaylee Williamson re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/23/2019. (jp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers.(Kane, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT 1st Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Shaylee Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barnes, #2 Summons Dayley, #3 Summons Edgley, #4 Summons Gilbert, #5 Summons Graham, #6 Summons Olsen, #7 Summons Powell, #8 Summons Sellers)(Hearn, Richard)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Tom Sellers, Kedrick Wills. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Waive. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE the Court has instructed Court staff not to discuss this case with Mr. Sellers, or with any other CSO. When all parties have appeared in this case, the Court will schedule a conference to discuss this issue. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 BOND in the amount of $ $1,000 posted by Shaylee Williamson (receipt number IDX400000766)(jp)
March 27, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #1 as the wrong event was used. The document will be re-filed by the Clerk using the correct event of Motion to Waive. (jp)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Waive Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 6-610(2)John Joseph Bulger appearing for Plaintiff Shaylee Williamson. Responses due by 4/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(jp)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Motion to Waive Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1865727.), filed by Shaylee Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hearn, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Wills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Graham
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Olsen
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Dayley
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gilbert
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Barnes
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sellers
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Edgley
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kedrick Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Powell
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaylee Williamson
Represented By: Stratton Paul Laggis
Represented By: John Joseph Bulger
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Represented By: Shane T Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?