Johnson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC

Plaintiff: Alexis Johnson
Defendant: Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00105
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Eisele, David)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Case Management deadline for joint litigation and discovery plan set for 7/16/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 3, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Alexis Johnson re #4 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/2/2019. (alw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Golden Valley Natural, LLC.(Eisele, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Johnson. Golden Valley Natural, LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Wessel, Jacob)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexis Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1867762.), filed by Alexis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Wessel, Jacob) Modified on 4/2/2019 to remove duplicate language on attachments (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Johnson
Represented By: Jacob S. Wessel
Represented By: Jacob Scott Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Represented By: Steven J Wright
Represented By: David Anthony Eisele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?