Larsen v. Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Douglas Larsen
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and Cigna Group Insurance
Case Number: 4:2019cv00106
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service Douglas Larson served on Hans N. Huggler on July 11, 2019, filed by Douglas Larsen. (Arnold, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that defendants have until 8/2/2019, to respond to the Amended Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint (filed as Stipulated Motion) Hans N Huggler appearing for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Huggler, Hans)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Cigna Group Insurance. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Douglas Larson against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Douglas Larsen. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Amend Complaint, #2 Summons for Amended Complaint)(Arnold, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Hans N Huggler for Life Insurance Company of North America Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Hans N. Huggler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1889975.)Austin Strobel appearing for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Strobel, Austin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. All Counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (the Report) by August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (alw)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (alw)
April 24, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00106-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1869480.), filed by Douglas Larsen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Arnold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen v. Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Hans N Huggler
Represented By: Austin Strobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Larsen
Represented By: James C Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?