Munden et al v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al

Plaintiff: Sherrilyn L Munden and Dennis L Munden
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company and Chicago Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00112
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Nathan M Olsen appearing for Plaintiffs Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden. Responses due by 8/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Sherrilyn L. Munden, #3 Declaration of Nathan M. Olsen, #4 Brief in Support of Motion and in Opposition to Chicago Title's Motion to Dismiss)(Olsen, Nathan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Joint Litigation and Discovery plan must be filed on or before 7/22/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 11:00 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 6/26/2019 (km)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING - Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale is hereby VACATED. (at)
June 12, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-112-DCN (alw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(alw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/10/2019 11:00 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. (at)
June 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 6/19/2019. Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due. (km)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE JOINT LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN (DKT. #20 ). The parties must file the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan on or before June 19, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: In consideration of the Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to File an Answer #13 , and that Defendant Stewart Title Guarantee Company filed its answer to the complaint within the extended time frame #14 , the Court hereby finds Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default against Stewart Title Guarantee Company #11 MOOT.Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (ah)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Stewart Title Guaranty Company re #14 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/25/2019. (km) Modified on 6/5/2019 to edit consent due date per LC14 (km).
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File the Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan Nathan M Olsen appearing for Plaintiffs Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Olsen, Nathan)
June 3, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 18 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE was filed incorrectly in this case. Consent deadline still stands, no action needed by parties.(alw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 *FILED IN ERROR* ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw) Modified on 6/3/2019 (alw).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: In consideration of the parties' stipulated Motion to Extend Response Time #15 , the Court hereby extends the deadline for Plaintiffs' response to Defendant Chicago Title's Motion to Dismiss #8 . Plaintiffs must file a response on or before June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (ah)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/13/2019)Matthew R Cleverley appearing for Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Cleverley, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Stewart Title Guaranty Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Stewart Title Guaranty Company.(Casey, Clinton)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER (DKT #12 ). Defendant Stewart Title must appear and file its answer or responsive pleading on or before May 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Sorensen, Dean)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default against Stewart Title Guaranty Company Nathan M Olsen appearing for Plaintiffs Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Olsen, Nathan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Chicago Title Insurance Company and Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/8/2019. (km)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company . (Cleverley, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Matthew R Cleverley appearing for Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Cleverley, Matthew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chicago Title Insurance Company for Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Cleverley, Matthew)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Cleverley on behalf of Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cleverley, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden. Chicago Title Insurance Company served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned, #2 Supplement)(Olsen, Nathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis L Munden, Sherrilyn L Munden. Stewart Title Guaranty Company served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Olsen, Nathan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chicago Title Insurance Company, Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Chicago Title Insurance Company)(cjs)
April 9, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Sherrilyn L Munden, Dennis L Munden was filed incorrectly in this case. Exhibits should be filed as a separate attachment(s) from the Complaint.No action is needed by the filing party as the Clerk's Office has separated the Exhibits from the Complaint.(cjs)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 6/3/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1869661.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Stewart Title, #2 Summons Chicago Title, #3 Cover Sheet)(Olsen, Nathan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/9/2019) (cjs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #4 Exhibit A, B & C) (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munden et al v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrilyn L Munden
Represented By: Nathan M Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L Munden
Represented By: Nathan M Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Clinton O Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R Cleverley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?