Rhodes v. Wells Fargo Customer Correspondence

Plaintiff: Marty Wayne Rhodes
Defendant: Wells Fargo Customer Correspondence
Case Number: 4:2019cv00124
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marty Wayne Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(alw)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Customer Correspondence, filed by Marty Wayne Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments, #2 Proposed Subpoena, #3 Proposed Summons)(jd) Modified on 4/17/2019 (cjs).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marty Wayne Rhodes. Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(jd) Modified on 4/17/2019 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Wells Fargo Customer Correspondence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Customer Correspondence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Wayne Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?