Tibbitts v. Armstrong
Petitioner: Robert Wesley Tibbitts
Respondent: Glen Armstrong
Case Number: 4:2019cv00155
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #4 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner may pay the $5.00 filing fee when Petitioner next receives funds in Petitioners prison trust account. Because an amended petition is required for Petitioner to proceed, Petitioners Motion for Amendment from Glen Armstrong, St. Anthony to John Carol I.F. CRC Manager (Dkt. #6 ), in which he requests substitution of the Respondent, is MOOT. In an amended petition, Petitioner must name the proper respondent. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner must file an amended petition as described above. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mailed 2254 to petitioner)(alw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Robert Wesley Tibbitts re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (Attachments: #1 Petition to Motion for Amendment, #2 Petitioner to Motion for Amendment, #3 Permission to Appeal, #4 Affidavit, #5 Another Affidavit, #6 Brief, #7 Declaration)(alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Robert Tibbetts(alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Amendment from Glen Armstrong, St. Anthony to John Carol IF. CRC Manager #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Robert Wesley Tibbitts. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Wesley Tibbitts. (alw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Robert Wesley Tibbitts. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (alw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #1 Application) (alw).
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Robert Wesley Tibbitts and counsel for Glen Armstrong re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/28/2019. (cjs)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
February 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Wesley Tibbitts. (Attachments: #1 USCA for the 9th Circuit Order 4/24/2019, No. 19-70590)(cjs)(Received in District Court 4/24/2019, but deemed filed 2/23/2019, pursuant to USCA Order, Attachment #1.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tibbitts v. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Glen Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Wesley Tibbitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?