Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC v. Franks
Plaintiff: Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC
Defendant: Christopher Franks
Case Number: 4:2019cv00166
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Counsel shall comply with Local Rule 4.1. (lc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Richard M Hunt for Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Richard M. Hunt. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1900046.)DeAnne Casperson appearing for Plaintiff Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Casperson, DeAnne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Franks. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Christopher Franks ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1883716.), filed by Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Casperson, DeAnne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC v. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rexburg Motor Sports, LLC
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?