Blue Spring Partners, LLC v. Amazon Seller YITU2019
Plaintiff: Blue Spring Partner, LLC, Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang and Blue Spring Partners, LLC
Defendant: Amazon Seller YITU2019, Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang
Case Number: 4:2019cv00181
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/30/2019 09:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 7/31/2019 10:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 7/24/2019. (at)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Within thirty days of the filing of the Complaint, the Plaintiff must file with the Court a status report regarding service of the summons and complaint. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests adifferent date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on July 30, 2019, at 9:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before July 23, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Spring Partners, LLC. (Frazer, Bradlee)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (km)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)VA 2-034-596 (Notice sent to USPTO) (km) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Complaint) (km).
June 5, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division. Please use case number 4:19-cv-181-CWD for all future filings. (km)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1890001.), filed by Blue Spring Partner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Frazer, Bradlee) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2019 with PDF that can't be edited) (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Spring Partners, LLC v. Amazon Seller YITU2019
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Spring Partner, LLC
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Spring Partners, LLC
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller YITU2019
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenjie Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?