VNS Federal Services, LLC v. Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC

Plaintiff: VNS Federal Services, LLC
Defendant: Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00204
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: In consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits B and C to the Verified Complaint #5 , and in consideration of District Local Civil Rule 5.3, the Court hereby grants the motion. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (ah)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Answer Verified Complaint by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. (Boatner, Ivan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #27 and #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ivan Boatner, Nicholas W Diegel for Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nicholas W. Diegel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1903430.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Keyes, J)
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ivan Boatner. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1903419.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Keyes, J)
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. VNS Federal Services, LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Bailey, John)
June 17, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #24 Affidavit of Service filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case. Please re-submit the filing as a Summons Returned Executed, located under Service of Process. (km)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Benjamin Greenberg and #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Jeremy R. Larson for Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk).(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC/Nicole Fruh on June 6, 2019, filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. (Bailey, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeremy R. (Jake) Larson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1900821.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Keyes, J)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin Greenberg. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1900820.)J Michael Keyes appearing for Defendant Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2019 (Keyes, J)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER denying #4 Motion for TRO. Pursuant to the Court's oral order on June 6, 2019, Plaintiff's motion to for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. Pursuant to discussions with Counsel, Plaintiff's alternative request for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint(with Exhibit A-I, Exhibt B and C are sealed), Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (with supporting Memorandum and Exhibit A-B), Motion for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery(with Supporting Memorandum and Exhibits A-B), Proposed Temporary Restraing Order, Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery, Pro Hac Vice Applications for Stephen Withee and for John Higgins, Corporate Disclosure for VNS Federal Services, and Certification of Counsel served on Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC on June 5, 2019, filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. (Bailey, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initiating Documents served on Trina Pollman on 06-05-2019, filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. (Bailey, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2019 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. Motion Denied. (ESR J. Bracke.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 3. (jlb)THESE MINUTES SHALL STAND AS THE ORDER OF THE COURT
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Brent Clark re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Declaration of Brent Clark) filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keyes, J)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. Replies due by 6/20/2019.(Keyes, J)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Keyes on behalf of Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC (Keyes, J)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 04:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The call information is as follows: Dial in number 1-877-336-1828, access code 4685496 and security code 9466(wm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-204-BLW(jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #8 & #9 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys John S Higgins and Stephen P Withee for VNS Federal Services, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John S. Higgins. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1896649.)John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen P. Withee. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1896648.)John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VNS Federal Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Environnement SA, Corporate Parent Veolia North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Veolia Nuclear Solutions, Inc. for VNS Federal Services, LLC.. (Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery Expedited John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document #3 Sealed Document, #1 Complaint, #2 Sealed Document John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction John A Bailey, Jr appearing for Plaintiff VNS Federal Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Document Re: #1 Complaint, Exhibit C. (Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Sealed Document Re: #1 Complaint, Exhibit B. (Bailey, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1896610.), filed by VNS Federal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Certification of Counsel, #9 Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Bailey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VNS Federal Services, LLC v. Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portsmouth Mission Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Ivan Boatner
Represented By: Benjamin Greenberg
Represented By: J Michael Keyes
Represented By: Nicholas W Diegel
Represented By: Jeremy R Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VNS Federal Services, LLC
Represented By: John S Higgins
Represented By: Stephen P Withee
Represented By: John A Bailey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?