American River Nutrition, LLC v. Kyani, Inc.
Plaintiff: American River Nutrition and American River Nutrition, LLC
Defendant: Kyani Inc and Kyani, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00255
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ryan T Santurri for American River Nutrition, LLC; granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Robert H Thornburg for American River Nutrition, LLC; granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephanie Vazquez for American River Nutrition, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American River Nutrition, LLC. Kyani, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Wright, Tracy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephanie Vazquez. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928766.)Tracy L Wright appearing for Plaintiff American River Nutrition, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Wright, Tracy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Robert H. Thornburg. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928761.)Tracy L Wright appearing for Plaintiff American River Nutrition, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Wright, Tracy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ryan T. Santurri. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1928745.)Tracy L Wright appearing for Plaintiff American River Nutrition, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 (Wright, Tracy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kyani, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American River Nutrition, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Designs for Health, Inc. for American River Nutrition, LLC.. (Wright, Tracy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff American River Nutrition re #1 Complaint . (Wright, Tracy)
July 8, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re docket number #1 Complaint filed by American River Nutrition refers to Exhibit A, which was not attached. If there is an Exhibit A, it can be filed as a Supplement and linked to the Complaint.(ckh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,350,453 B1 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ckh)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
July 8, 2019 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 4:19-cv-255-REB for all future filings. (ckh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by American River Nutrition. (Wright, Tracy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Kyani Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1909542.), filed by American River Nutrition.(Wright, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American River Nutrition, LLC v. Kyani, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyani Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyani, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American River Nutrition
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American River Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Tracy L Wright
Represented By: Ryan T Santurri
Represented By: Robert H Thornburg
Represented By: Stephanie Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?