Stobaugh et al v. Rabbit Brush, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neal Stobaugh and Lezlie Stobaugh
Defendant: BUSINESS ENTITY DOES I through X, Big-D Construction Corp., DOES I through X and Rabbit Brush, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00312
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Robert H Whaley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019. (Per Notice, docket #7)(st)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that a telephonic scheduling conference will be held on 11/5/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel and pro se parties shall use the following information to participate in the hearing: Phone number: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 7667996#. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 11:30 AM before Judge Robert H. Whaley. (st)
August 30, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00312-RHW on all future pleadings. (st)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert H. Whaley from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big-D Construction Corp., Rabbit Brush, LLC. (Ford, Michael)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/15/2019. (ckh)
August 15, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Big-D Construction Corp. served on 8/15/2019; Rabbit Brush, LLC served on 8/15/2019. (ckh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Janicki on behalf of Big-D Construction Corp., Rabbit Brush, LLC (Janicki, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Big-D Construction Corp., Rabbit Brush, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Docket)(Ford, Michael)
August 15, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Big-D Construction Corp. and Rabbit Brush, LLC was filed incorrectly in this case. A federal Civil Cover Sheet needs to be attached to the Notice of Removal as a separate document. In addition, the state court docket or register of action should also be attached separately. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing as a Supplement to docket entry number #1 so as to not be charged again. (ckh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Big-D Construction Corp., Rabbit Brush, LLC from Seventh District Court, Teton County, case number 41-19-0168.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1925518.), filed by Big-D Construction Corp., Rabbit Brush, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Ford, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stobaugh et al v. Rabbit Brush, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSINESS ENTITY DOES I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big-D Construction Corp.
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Ford
Represented By: Robert L Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbit Brush, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Ford
Represented By: Robert L Janicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Stobaugh
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A. Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lezlie Stobaugh
Represented By: Kenneth L. Pedersen
Represented By: Jarom A. Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?