Beach et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Beach and Shelton Beach
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Xome, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Equifax, Innovis Data Solutions, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Experian Corp, Transunion and Countrywide Home Loans
Case Number: 4:2019cv00340
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER EXPEDITING briefing on Motion for TRO (Dkt. 27). Defendants are directed to file a response to the Motion for TRO on or before November 5, 2019. The Court will notify the parties if a reply brief is needed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Docket Entry Order to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((lat)
November 1, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION and Order on Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Beverly Beach, Shelton Beach. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION of Clarification: submit documents to support "denial" of Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Beverly Beach, Shelton Beach. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (jd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 Answer on Motion to Dismiss re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice filed by Beverly Beach and Shelton Beach. Replies due by 11/12/2019. (ckh)
October 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice. Responses due by 10/29/2019. (ckh)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time (Dkt. #20 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have until on or before October 29, 2019 to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 11:30 AM is VACATED AND RESET for Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Boise, Idaho before Judge Candy W. Dale. The Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans are due on or before December 2, 2019 in accordance with the Courts Litigation Order (Dkt. 9). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Answer on Motion to Dismiss re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Beverly Beach. Responses due by 11/1/2019. (ckh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #18 Joinder and #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice. (ckh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 JOINDER by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans joining #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice . (Varallo, Christopher)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(McConnell, Kelly)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McConnell, Kelly)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Judicial Notice Kelly Greene McConnell appearing for Defendants Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(McConnell, Kelly)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Upon consideration of Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and CountrywideHome Loans' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, (Dkt. #12 ), and the Court having reviewed the Motion and finding good cause therefor, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 12) is GRANTED. Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. shall have up to and including September 24, 2019 within which to answer, move, or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Christopher G. Varallo appearing for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Form of Proposed Order)(Varallo, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. #10 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Xome, Inc; Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. shall have up to and including September 24, 2019, within which to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Copmplaint Kelly Greene McConnell appearing for Defendants Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Respond)(McConnell, Kelly)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan deadline set for 10/15/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 11:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (ckh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00340-CWD for all future filings. (ckh)
September 3, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Aurora Loan Services, LLC served on 9/3/2019; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. served on 9/3/2019; Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 9/3/2019; Transunion served on 9/3/2019; Xome, Inc. served on 9/3/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. (McConnell, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. (McConnell, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. (McConnell, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Nationstar's Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (McConnell, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Xome, Inc.. (McConnell, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Xome, Inc. from District Court of the Seventh Judicial District, County of Bingham, case number CV-06-19-1455.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1934686.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Xome, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Action, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McConnell, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beach et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Greene McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xome, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Greene McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Greene McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kelly Greene McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion
Represented By: Kelly Greene McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelton Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?