Magee, et al. v. J.R. Simplot Company
Plaintiff: Susan Magee and Lance Magee
Defendant: J.R. Simplot Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00353
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Lance Magee, Susan Magee . (Horn, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 02:30 PM MTN. TIME in Telephonic Hearing - before Judge Ronald E. Bush. DOCKET NOTE: Stipulated Plans are now DUE on or before NOVEMBER 7, 2019.(lc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 11:00 AM (Mountain Time) in Telephonic Hearing - before Judge Ronald E. Bush. The Parties shall refer to the ORDER/DOC.5 to submit their Stipulated Lit/Discovery Plans; *However the Plans are now DUE on or Before NOV.4, 2019. Mr. Horn shall initiate the Conference Call, connecting all parties and the Court at (208) 334-1495.(lc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF VACATED HEARING: Due to the reassignment of this case, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for November 25, 2019 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill is vacated. The hearing will be reset before Judge Ronald E. Bush by a separate notice. (jlb)
October 25, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:19-cv-00353-REB. (jd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lance Magee, Susan Magee (Horn, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lance Magee and Susan Magee and to counsel for J.R. Simplot Company re #1 Complaint and #3 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/16/2019. (jd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by J.R. Simplot Company.(Crawford, J)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to J.R. Simplot Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 4:19-cv-353 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1939609.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Horn, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee, et al. v. J.R. Simplot Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Magee
Represented By: Robert W Horn
Represented By: Robert W. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Magee
Represented By: Robert W Horn
Represented By: Robert W. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Simplot Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?