JE Dunn Construction Company v. JM Concrete Inc et al
Plaintiff: JE Dunn Construction Company
Defendant: Superior Roofing Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: JM Concrete, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Federal Insurance Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00368
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #11 Third Party Complaint, #10 Counterclaim or Stay Proceedings Jan D Sokol appearing for Plaintiff JE Dunn Construction Company. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas A. Larkin)(Sokol, Jan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JM Concrete, Inc.. (Krueck, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Superior Roofing Company, Inc.. (Babcock, Brian)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Federal Insurance Company served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Sokol, Jan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Summons, #2 Federal Insurance Company Summons) (ckh)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for JM Concrete, Inc. re #9 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/30/2019. (ckh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, filed by JM Concrete, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Third-Party Complaint to Hartford Fire Insurance Company, #2 Summons on Third-Party Complaint to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, #3 Summons on Third-Party Complaint to Federal Insurance Company)(Krueck, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against JE Dunn Construction Company, filed by JM Concrete, Inc..(Krueck, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 JM Concrete, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JM Concrete, Inc..(Krueck, David)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for JE Dunn Construction Company, Superior Roofing Company, Inc. re #7 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/23/2019. (jp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Response to Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration Under the Federal Arbitration Act by Superior Roofing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Demand Letter 5.8.2019, #2 Exhibit B-Email to Counsel 9.19.2019)(Babcock, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JE Dunn Construction Company. JM Concrete, Inc. served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Sokol, Jan)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 02:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before December 4, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JE Dunn Construction Company. Superior Roofing Company, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Sokol, Jan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JM Concrete, Inc., Superior Roofing Company, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JE Dunn Construction Company. (Sokol, Jan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT against JM Concrete, Inc., Superior Roofing Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1943948.), filed by JE Dunn Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons JM Concrete, #4 Summons Superior Roofing)(Sokol, Jan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JE Dunn Construction Company v. JM Concrete Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JE Dunn Construction Company
Represented By: Jan D Sokol
Represented By: Thomas A. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JM Concrete, Inc.
Represented By: David T Krueck
Represented By: Jaclyn Terese Gans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Roofing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?