Thompson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Zachariah E. Thompson
Defendant: Jeff Peters and Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00375
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (COMPLEX TRACK)- All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by November 13, 2020. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before February 4, 2020. ADR must be held by May 31, 2020. All fact discovery must be completed by October 16, 2020. The Court will conduct a telephonic status conference with the parties on May 4, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Zachariah E. Thompson. (Larsen, Reed)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN by Zachariah E. Thompson . (Larsen, Reed)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 7, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters.(Eisele, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Golden Valley Natural, LLC. (Eisele, David)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Golden Valley Natural, LLC, Jeff Peters, Zachariah E. Thompson re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/2/2019. (alw)
September 30, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Golden Valley Natural, LLC served on 9/30/2019; Jeff Peters served on 9/30/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Bingham County Idaho District Court, case number CV06-19-1584.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1946272.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #4 Summons - Jeff Peters, #5 Affidavit of Return - Golden Valley Natural, LLC, #6 Affidavit of Return - Jeff Peters, #7 State Docket Sheet)(Eisele, David) Modified on 10/2/2019 to remove duplicate wording(alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Golden Valley Natural, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Peters
Represented By: David Anthony Eisele
Represented By: Steven J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Valley Natural, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Eisele
Represented By: Steven J Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah E. Thompson
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Javier L Gabiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?