Dormaier v. City of Soap Lake et al.
Plaintiff: Soap Lake Police Chief Jim Dorris, Caleb V Dormaier, City of Soap Lake, Sheena Anderson Paralegal, Justin D Rowland and Caleb V. Dormaier
Defendant: Justin D. Rowland
Case Number: 4:2019cv00393
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Confirmation case was transferred and opened as 2:19-cv-00354. (jd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE re: #2 Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is transferred to the Eastern District ofWashington. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case Douglas Dwight Phelps appearing for Plaintiff Caleb V. Dormaier. Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Phelps, Douglas)
October 11, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please file the civil cover sheet (JS44).(jd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Dormaier, Caleb V. against City of Soap Lake ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1952296.), filed by Caleb V Dormaier. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Phelps, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dormaier v. City of Soap Lake et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soap Lake Police Chief Jim Dorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb V Dormaier
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Soap Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Anderson Paralegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin D Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb V. Dormaier
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin D. Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?