Clegg v. City of Rigby, et al.
Plaintiff: Trina K Clegg and Trina K. Clegg
Defendant: Rigby Police Department, Brad Tinsley, City of Rigby and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2019cv00394
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 10:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. See Dkt. 5. (at)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trina K. Clegg. Rigby Police Department served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Meikle, Stephen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trina K. Clegg. Brad Tinsley served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Meikle, Stephen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trina K. Clegg. City of Rigby served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Meikle, Stephen)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadlines and Continue Scheduling Conference. (Dkt. 4.) The parties shall file their litigation plan and discovery plan on or before January 20, 2020 in accordance with the Courts Litigation Order. (Dkt. 3.) The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for December 11, 2019 is VACATED AND RESET for Monday, January 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (MT) in Boise, Idaho. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan, MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference ( Responses due by 12/18/2019)Stephen A Meikle appearing for Plaintiff Trina K. Clegg. (Meikle, Stephen)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on December 11, 2019, at 1:30 PM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before December 4, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Rigby, Rigby Police Department and Brad Tinsley. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 City of Rigby, #2 Rigby Police Department)(jd)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trina K Clegg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1952761.), filed by Trina K Clegg. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons City of Rigby, #3 Summons Rigby Police Department, #4 Summons Brad Tinsley)(Meikle, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clegg v. City of Rigby, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina K Clegg
Represented By: Stephen A Meikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina K. Clegg
Represented By: Stephen A Meikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigby Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?