Ormond Builders, Inc. v. Shoshone-Bannock Tribes, et al.
Plaintiff: Ormond Builders, Inc.
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Shoshone-Bannock Tribes
Case Number: 4:2020cv00028
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue #12 is GRANTED. The hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction 7 is VACATED. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on 3/18/2020 at 11:00 AM. The Plaintiff shall call the Court at 208-334-1891 with all parties on the line. If the case is settled prior to the status conference the parties shall notify the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (wcf)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Frederick J Hahn, III appearing for Plaintiff Ormond Builders, Inc.. Responses due by 3/17/2020 (Hahn, Frederick)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ormond Builders, Inc. and Shoshone-Bannock Tribes re #1 Complaint and #10 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/20/2020. (ckh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes.(Echo Hawk, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Paul Echo Hawk filed by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes in Support of Shoshone-Bannock Tribes Opposition to Ormond Builders Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Echo Hawk, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shoshone-Bannock Tribes. Replies due by 2/28/2020.(Echo Hawk, Paul)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: A Motion Hearing is set for 2/28/2020 at 3:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Plaintiff is directed to serve this notice upon the defendant. (jlb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Donald J. Ormond in Support of Plaintiff Ormond Builders, Inc.s Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ormond Builders, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Larkin, Thomas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Larkin in Support of Plaintiff Ormond Builders, Inc.s Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ormond Builders, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Larkin, Thomas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Thomas A. Larkin appearing for Plaintiff Ormond Builders, Inc.. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Larkin, Thomas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shoshone-Bannock Tribes. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Donna Thompson)(jd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ormond Builders, Inc.. (Larkin, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1997081.), filed by Ormond Builders, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Larkin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ormond Builders, Inc. v. Shoshone-Bannock Tribes, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoshone-Bannock Tribes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ormond Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?