Borjas v. Idaho Central Credit Union
Plaintiff: Edwin Borjas
Defendant: Idaho Central Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2020cv00065
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Idaho Central Credit Union. The Court, having reviewed the Parties Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Dkt. #18 , and finding good cause therefore, hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union shall have until and through April 29, 2020, to respond to the Amended Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Colleen Rosannah Smith appearing for Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union. Responses due by 4/20/2020 (Smith, Colleen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Idaho Central Credit Union, filed by Edwin Borjas.(Hepworth, J)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jeffrey Kaliel for Edwin Borjas. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 ERRATA by Plaintiff Edwin Borjas re #14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Kaliel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2026223.) . (Hepworth, J)
March 17, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY. The application for pro hac vice admission filed at docket 14 does not contain the required statement that it was "signed under penalty of perjury" by the applicant and designee. Please resubmit the application with the required language as an Errata, linking it to docket 14, so that you are not charged again. (ckh)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Kaliel. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2026223.)J Charles Hepworth appearing for Plaintiff Edwin Borjas. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Hepworth, J)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Litigation Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference issued on March 4, 2020 by Judge Dale is ADOPTED by this Court. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference remains set for 5/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge David C. Nye. The parties are instructed to call 208-334-1026 at the time of the hearing. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 4:20-cv-00065-DCN. (ckh)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on May 4, 2020, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before April 27, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Idaho Central Credit Union. The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, (Dkt. #9 ), and finding good cause therefore, hereby GRANTS the motion and ORDERS as follows: Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union shall have until and through March 31, 2020, to respond to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Colleen Rosannah Smith appearing for Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union. Responses due by 3/24/2020 (Smith, Colleen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Central Credit Union. (Smith, Colleen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Edwin Borjas and Idaho Central Credit Union re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/4/2020. (ckh)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew Soukup for Idaho Central Credit Union. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew Soukup. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2020107.)Colleen Rosannah Smith appearing for Defendant Idaho Central Credit Union. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Smith, Colleen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Rosannah Smith on behalf of Idaho Central Credit Union (Smith, Colleen)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin Borjas (Hepworth, J)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Idaho Central Credit Union. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
February 7, 2020 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale. Please use case number 4:20-cv-00065-CWD for all future filings. (ckh)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Idaho Central Credit Union ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2007610.), filed by Edwin Borjas. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Hepworth, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borjas v. Idaho Central Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Central Credit Union
Represented By: Colleen Rosannah Smith
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Borjas
Represented By: J Charles Hepworth
Represented By: John Joseph Janis
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Represented By: Philip Howard Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?