Kids Town At The Falls LLC v. The City of Rexburg
Plaintiff: Kids Town At The Falls LLC
Defendant: City of Rexburg
Case Number: 4:2020cv00083
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kids Town At The Falls LLC. City of Rexburg served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Swanson, Scott)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before May 20, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 31, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Rexburg, and counsel for Kids Town At The Falls LLC re #1 Complaint and the #5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/1/2020. (jd)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Rexburg.(Angell, Sam)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Rexburg. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action copyright registration no. VAu 1-337-803 (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (jd)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kids Town At The Falls LLC. (Swanson, Scott)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Rexburg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2012634.), filed by Kids Town At The Falls LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Swanson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kids Town At The Falls LLC v. The City of Rexburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kids Town At The Falls LLC
Represented By: Scott David Swanson
Represented By: Brian Faria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rexburg
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?