Clarke v. White Pine Charter School, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clarke
Defendant: Emmalee Robinson, White Pine Charter School, Inc., Mark Duncanson, Jim Seamans, Dee Armstrong, Joni Larsen and Joanna Stark
Case Number: 4:2020cv00214
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dee Armstrong, Mark Duncanson, Joni Larsen, Emmalee Robinson, Joanna Stark, White Pine Charter School, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent White Pine Charter School, Inc. for White Pine Charter School, Inc.. (Gardner, David)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 8, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2020 04:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Dee Armstrong, Jeremy Clarke, Mark Duncanson, Joni Larsen, Emmalee Robinson, Jim Seamans, Joanna Stark, White Pine Charter School, Inc. re #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/3/2020. (jd)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dee Armstrong, Mark Duncanson, Joni Larsen, Emmalee Robinson, Jim Seamans, Joanna Stark, White Pine Charter School, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Gardner, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Duncanson, #2 Robinson, #3 Larsen, #4 Seamans, #5 Stark, #6 White Pine Charter School)(jd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2045456.), filed by Jeremy Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Casperson, DeAnne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. White Pine Charter School, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmalee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Pine Charter School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Duncanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Seamans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Clarke
Represented By: Ryan S. Dustin
Represented By: DeAnne Casperson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?