Christianson et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Wei S Christianson and Jon L Christianson
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00325
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/30/2020 03:00 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill is hereby RESCHEDULED to occur before Judge Candy W. Dale - Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers. Parties and/or members of the public may use the following to attend this matter: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 9/23/2020. (same date/time as previously set, new presiding judge only - due to reassignment) (at)
August 12, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 4:20-cv-00325-CWD. (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jon L Christianson, Wei S Christianson and United States of America re #1 Complaint and #6 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/13/2020. (ckh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of United States of America (England, Christine)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before September 23, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2020 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon L Christianson, Wei S Christianson. United States of America served on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barker, Albert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B)(Barker, Albert)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2068756.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A&B, #2 Summons, #3 Cover sheet)(Barker, Albert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christianson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei S Christianson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon L Christianson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?