Hansen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Clifford M Hansen
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00326
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Clifford M Hansen and United States of America. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/13/2020. (ckh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (England, Christine)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford M Hansen. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 6/30/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barker, Albert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Clifford M Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford M Hansen
Represented By: Scott Allan Magnuson
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?