Carranza v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: David Carranza
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00364
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Per docket #69 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
October 27, 2022 Filing 69 STIPULATION of Dismissal General Judgment by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Coleman, Timothy)
October 5, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE by David Carranza of Settlement (Vucinovich, James)
October 3, 2022 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William G Young: Status Conference held (by video) on 10/3/2022. Counsel shall submit photos to be admitted to which there is objection. The case will then be reassigned to a resident judge in Idaho for jury trial. (Court Reporter/ESR Richard Romanow (bulldog@richromanow.com).) (jg)THESE MINUTES SHALL STAND AS THE ORDER OF THE COURT
September 27, 2022 Filing 66 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Video Status Conference set for 10/3/2022 10:00 AM by Video Zoom before Judge William G Young. Zoom meeting invite to be sent to counsel of record prior to the hearing. Motion Granted re: #65 Joint MOTION for Trial SCHEDULING filed by David Carranza. Approved by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 27, 2022 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Trial SCHEDULING James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 7/18/2022 (Vucinovich, James)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PRE-TRIAL ORDER - Doc. No. #37 Motion to compel denied. Doc. No. #45 Motion to strike allowed in part and denied in part. Doc. No. #47 Motion to exclude allowed in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Strike filed by David Carranza.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2022.(Vucinovich, James)
May 9, 2022 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Exclude Expert Robert Andres filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2022.(Coleman, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 61 Exhibit List with Defendant's Objections by Union Pacific Railroad Company.. (Coleman, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Timothy J. Coleman re #59 Response to Motion filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION in Limine filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Replies due by 5/13/2022.(Coleman, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 58 Exhibit List with Plaintiff's Objections by David Carranza.. (Vucinovich, James)
April 29, 2022 Filing 57 DECLARATION of James K. Vucinovich filed by David Carranza . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Vucinovich, James)
April 29, 2022 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION in Limine filed by David Carranza. Replies due by 5/13/2022.(Vucinovich, James)
April 28, 2022 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Timothy J. Coleman re #53 Response to Motion filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 28, 2022 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Tom G. Faciszewski, MD re #53 Response to Motion filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company . (Coleman, Timothy)
April 28, 2022 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Strike filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Replies due by 5/12/2022.(Coleman, Timothy)
April 28, 2022 Filing 52 DECLARATION of James K. Vucinovich re #51 Response to Motion filed by David Carranza . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Vucinovich, James)
April 28, 2022 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Exclude Expert Robert Andres filed by David Carranza. Replies due by 5/12/2022.(Vucinovich, James)
April 27, 2022 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Timothy Coleman re #49 Response to Motion filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Replies due by 5/11/2022.(Coleman, Timothy)
April 14, 2022 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Timothy Coleman re #47 MOTION to Exclude Expert Robert Andres filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 14, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Exclude Expert Robert Andres Timothy J Coleman appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 5/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Def's Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Robert Andres)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 14, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of James K. Vucinovich re #45 MOTION to Strike filed by David Carranza . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Vucinovich, James)
April 14, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Strike James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 5/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Vucinovich, James)
April 8, 2022 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Timothy Coleman re #43 MOTION in Limine filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company . (Coleman, Timothy)
April 8, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION in Limine Timothy J Coleman appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 4/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum ISO Motion in Limine)(Coleman, Timothy)
April 8, 2022 Filing 42 DECLARATION of James K. Vucinovich re #41 MOTION in Limine filed by David Carranza . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Vucinovich, James)
April 8, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION in Limine James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 4/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support)(Vucinovich, James)
April 8, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript of Proceedings held on March 15, 2022 before Judge William G. Young. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard H. Romanow, Email bulldog@richromanow.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed until release of transcript restriction. Redaction Request due 4/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2022. (jd)
April 6, 2022 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Compel filed by David Carranza.(Vucinovich, James)
April 6, 2022 Filing 38 DECLARATION of James K. Vucinovich re #37 MOTION to Compel filed by David Carranza . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vucinovich, James)
April 6, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 4/27/2022 (Vucinovich, James)
March 15, 2022 Filing 36 DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/15/2022. Counsel present: Attorneys Vucinovich, Larsen and Budge for the plaintiff and Attorneys Coleman and Laforest for the defendant. The Court reviews joint pretrial memorandum with counsel and orders a joint list of exhibits be filed all exhibits without objection shall be marked with numbers and any objected to exhibits shall be marked with letters (A-Z, AA, AB, AC-AZ, BA, BB, BC etc.). Any motions in limine, objected to exhibits, Daubert motions etc. shall be filed within 45 days. The Court will reach out to the Chief Judge in Idaho regarding trial date and how it is expected for him to proceed as a visiting judge. The Court offers to preside over a non-jury trial should the parties all consent to waive a jury. Trial is to take no longer than ten (10) trial days. (Court Reporter/ESR Richard Romanow (bulldog@richromanow.com) (30 min.) (jd) Modified on 3/21/2022 to include additional info (kt).
March 14, 2022 Filing 35 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by David Carranza. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiff's Witness List, #3 Defendant's Witness and Exhibit List)(Vucinovich, James)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #33 Expedited MOTION Set Status Conference filed by David Carranza. Joint Pretrial Memorandum due on or before March 14, 2022. Video Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 02:15 PM (EST)/11:15 AM (MT) before Judge William G Young. Zoom information is forthcoming. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 26, 2022 Filing 33 Expedited MOTION Set Status Conference James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 2/16/2022 (Vucinovich, James)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER allowing #31 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 1, 2021 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Use, Dissemination and Disclosure of Family Photographs Hansary Laforest appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 12/22/2021 (Laforest, Hansary)
November 10, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by James K Vucinovich (Vucinovich, James)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DOCKET TEXT ORDER allowing #28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. There shall be no further continuances. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 26, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Hansary Laforest appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 11/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hansary Laforest in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines, #2 Second Amended Litigation Plan)(Laforest, Hansary)
October 13, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Expedited MOTION to Compel filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Laforest, Hansary)
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Expedited MOTION to Compel filed by David Carranza. Replies due by 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James K. Vucinovich, #2 Exhibit 1)(Vucinovich, James)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (Modified). Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER allowing #23 Motion to Compel, subject to the conditions set forth in the letter of September 14, 2021. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 Expedited MOTION to Compel Hansary Laforest appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 10/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Donna Wicher in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Wicher, #4 Declaration of Laforest in Support, #5 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Laforest, #6 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Laforest, #7 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Laforest, #8 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Laforest, #9 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Laforest, #10 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Laforest, #11 Exhibit 7 Declaration of Laforest, #12 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Laforest, #13 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Laforest, #14 Exhibit 10 Declaration of Laforest, #15 Exhibit 11 Declaration of Laforest)(Laforest, Hansary)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER allowing #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 4, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Hansary Laforest appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 6/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hansary Laforest in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines, #2 Amended Litigation Plan)(Laforest, Hansary)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Hans Laforest for Union Pacific Railroad Company Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge William G Young. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Hansary Laforest. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BIDDC-2201957.)Timothy J Coleman appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 5/7/2021 (Coleman, Timothy)
January 13, 2021 Filing 18 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William G Young: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2021. Attorneys Vucinovich for the plaintiff and Attorney Coleman for the defendant.The Court explains his role as visiting Judge and review the parties joint statement which is adopted by the Court as a case management order. A final pretrial conference will be held in February 2022. A joint pretrial memorandum is to be filed on or before February 1, 2022. Procedural order to issue in January 2022. The Court answers questions of counsel. If the case were to settle, counsel are instructed to notify the clerk. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow.) (st)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 Statement Local Rule 16.1(D) Joint Statement filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Joint Statement (Discovery Plan), #2 Exhibit 2 to Joint Statement (Litigation Plan), #3 Exhibit 3 to Joint Statement (Certifications Pursuant to 16.1(D)(3)))(Coleman, Timothy)
January 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Video Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2021 12:00 PM (Mountain Time)/2:00 PM (Eastern Time) by Zoom before Judge William G Young. Video information will be sent to counsel by separate email. (st)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by David Carranza of Unavailability of Counsel (Vucinovich, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Coleman, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William G Young from the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 1, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William G. Young. Please use case number 4:20-cv-00364-WGY on all future pleadings. (st)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James K. Vucinovich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2090711.)Reed W Larsen appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Larsen, Reed)
August 13, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - re #8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James K. Vucinovich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2087167.) filed by David Carranza. The Motion for Pro Hac Vice is not signed by local counsel the Designee. Please sign and re-file you motion using ECF event "Errata". Do not re-file using the Motion for Pro Hac Vice otherwise you will be charged again.(jd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 DISREGARD - MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James K. Vucinovich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2087167.)James K Vucinovich appearing for Plaintiff David Carranza. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vucinovich, James) Modified on 8/20/2020, see corrective entry (jd).
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Carranza. All Defendants. (Vucinovich, James)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for David Carranza and counsel for Union Pacific Railroad Company re #1 Complaint, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/2/2020. (jd)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants request for an extension of time, up to and including Monday, September 15, 2020, to file a response pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Timothy J Coleman appearing for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Coleman, Timothy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Coleman, Timothy)
July 31, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Union Pacific Railroad Company answer due 9/15/2020. (jd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2078854.), filed by David Carranza. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Larsen, Reed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Timothy J Coleman
Represented By: Hansary Laforest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carranza
Represented By: Reed W Larsen
Represented By: Reed Larsen
Represented By: James Vucinovich
Represented By: James K Vucinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?