Worrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joshua Leon Worrell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Respondent: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00458
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #12 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It has been re-filed with the correct service date at dkt #13 .(jp)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Andrew Saul (Rodriguez, Joanne)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Leon Worrell. Andrew Saul served on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Gerrard, Josephine)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Leon Worrell. Andrew Saul served on 10/11/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail receipt)(Gerrard, Josephine) Modified on 10/29/2020 to indicate to disregard- see corrective entry (jp).
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Joshua Leon Worrell re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/21/2020. (jp)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Josephine Gerrard for Joshua Leon Worrell. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Josephine Mary Gerrard. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2107815.)Todd D Pingel appearing for Plaintiff Joshua Leon Worrell. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Pingel, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Todd D Pingel appearing for Plaintiff Joshua Leon Worrell. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Pingel, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Joshua Leon Worrell This is a sealed document.. (Pingel, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Joshua Leon Worrell. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Pingel, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worrell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Leon Worrell
Represented By: Todd D Pingel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Joanne P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?