Larson et al v. T&J Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Larson, Joseph MELFI and Lindy Larson
Defendant: T&J TRANSPORTATION, LLC, Does 1 through 100 and Joseph Robert Melfi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00480
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TRACK: Standard. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2021, Discovery due by 2/28/2022, ADR must be held by 9/30/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2022, Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/16/2021 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Lindy Larson. (Beyler, Brett)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Lindy Larson . (Beyler, Brett)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on February 9, 2021, at 3:00 pm mountain time in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiffs must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9145 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before February 2, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:20-cv-480-BLW(jp)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Eric Larson, Lindy Larson, Joseph Robert Melfi, T&J Transportation, LLC re #1 Complaint, #7 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/1/2021. (jp)
December 29, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Answer and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Joseph Robert Melfi, T&J Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Information Sheet)(Montgomery, Gary)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lindy Larson Proof of Service Summons in Civil Action (Beyler, Brett)
October 28, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brett D Beyler, #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David P Mastagni, and #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Grant A Winter for Eric Larson and Lindy Larson. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brett Beyler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2120739.)Kevin Andrew Henry Shupperd appearing for Plaintiffs Eric Larson, Lindy Larson. Responses due by 11/17/2020 (Shupperd, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brett Beyler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2120737.)Kevin Andrew Henry Shupperd appearing for Plaintiffs Eric Larson, Lindy Larson. Responses due by 11/17/2020 (Shupperd, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brett D. Beyler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2120727.)Kevin Andrew Henry Shupperd appearing for Plaintiffs Eric Larson, Lindy Larson. Responses due by 11/17/2020 (Shupperd, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Robert Melfi, T&J Transportation, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Melfi Summons) (ckh)
October 13, 2020 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission attached to entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Eric Larson and Lindy Larson, were filed incorrectly in this case. Please resubmit the motions using the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance event located at Civil/Motions and Related Filings/Motions/Pro Hac Vice Admission. Each motion needs to be filed separately and will incur a $250 charge. (ckh)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lindy Larson, Eric Larson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2113370.), filed by Lindy Larson, Eric Larson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Melfi, #3 Summons Summons - T&J Transportation, #4 Pro Hac Vice, #5 Pro Hac Vice, #6 Pro Hac Vice)(Shupperd, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson et al v. T&J Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Larson
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Henry Shupperd
Represented By: David P Mastagni
Represented By: Grant A Winter
Represented By: Brett D Beyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph MELFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindy Larson
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Henry Shupperd
Represented By: David P Mastagni
Represented By: Grant A Winter
Represented By: Brett D Beyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&J TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Gary L Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Robert Melfi
Represented By: Gary L Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?