Key et al v. US GreenFiber, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Richard Key and Tally May Henry Key
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and US GreenFiber, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00233
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct AND TO SHORTEN RESPONSE TIME Michael Finton Lutz appearing for Plaintiffs Tally May Henry Key, James Richard Key. Responses due by 8/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Email Circulating FAC, #3 Exhibit 2 Attached Redline FAC, #4 Exhibit 3 Attached Clean Copy of FAC)(Lutz, Michael)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant US GreenFiber, LLC re #8 Notice (Other), #7 Declaration of John A. Bailey, Jr. in Support of US Greenfiber, LLC's Notice of Consent to Removal. (Bailey, John)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Pursuant to an informal conference with counsel in this matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and rescheduled for 8/31/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David C. Nye. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to submit their Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan is RESET for 8/24/2021. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ab)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. On or before 7/21/21, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US GreenFiber, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Greenfiber Holdings, LLC for US GreenFiber, LLC. (Bailey, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by US GreenFiber, LLC.(Bailey, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant Home Depot's ANSWER to Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Shewbert, Kelsey)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by US GreenFiber, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent (Bailey, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of John A. Bailey Jr. in Support of US Greenfiber LLC's Notice of Consent to Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by US GreenFiber, LLC . (Bailey, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tally May Henry Key, James Richard Key. US GreenFiber, LLC served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Lutz, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tally May Henry Key, James Richard Key. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Lutz, Michael)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Tally May Henry Key, James Richard Key, US GreenFiber, LLC. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/2/2021. (kt)
June 2, 2021 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/1/2021; US GreenFiber, LLC served on 6/1/2021. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (kt)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Shewbert, Kelsey)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kelsey L. Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. . (Shewbert, Kelsey)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Bonneville County District Court Seventh Judicial District, case number CV10-21-2615.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2223812.), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Register of Actions, #4 Cover Sheet)(Shewbert, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key et al v. US GreenFiber, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey L Shewbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US GreenFiber, LLC
Represented By: John A Bailey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Richard Key
Represented By: Michael Finton Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tally May Henry Key
Represented By: Michael Finton Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?