Yeaman v. City of Burley, et al.
Plaintiff: Lindsey Yeaman
Defendant: City of Burley and Dee Hodge
Case Number: 4:2021cv00345
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Burley and Dee Hodge and counsel for Lindsey Yeaman re #7 Answer to Amended Complaint and #3 Amended Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/23/2021. (jd)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: the Court will conduct a Telephonic scheduling conference on November 29, 2021, 10:00 A.M. *Mountain time. Counsel must initiate the conference call by calling the Courts conferencing line at 1-888-684-8852, Access Code 2777014#. On or before November 22, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by City of Burley, Dee Hodge.(Hall, Blake)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsey Yeaman. Dee Hodge served on 9/6/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Gadd, David)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsey Yeaman. City of Burley served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Gadd, David)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Burley and Dee Hodge. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for City of Burley)(jd)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lindsey Yeaman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hodge Summons, #3 Summons City of Burley Summons)(Gadd, David)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Raymond E. Patricco Jr. Please use case number 4:21-cv-00345-REP for all future filings. (lm)
August 25, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please File the civil cover sheet (JS 44)(lm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Burley, Dee Hodge ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2261933.), filed by Lindsey Yeaman.(Gadd, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeaman v. City of Burley, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Yeaman
Represented By: David W. Gadd
Represented By: Kelly Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Burley
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Hodge
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?