Smith v. USA
Petitioner: Jacob Paul Smith
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00430
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON GOVERNMENTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE - Plaintiff United States of America is hereby granted its motion (Dkt. #3 ) for an extension of time in which to file its response to defendants Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Said response is now due March 3, 2022. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) Modified on 12/6/2021 to edit text(lm).
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Justin K Paskett appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Paskett, Justin)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 - The United States shall file a written response to the petitioners motion within thirty (30) days from the date of this scheduling order. The petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
November 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 12/3/2021. (jd)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 4:19-cr-304-DCN.), filed by Jacob Paul Smith. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Summary, #2 Envelope) (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Justin K Paskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?