Sentry Select Insurance Company v. Skiers Choice, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company as subrogee of Precision, Inc dba Preision Boats, Precision Boats, Skier's Choice, Inc, Indmar Products Co., Inc., Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc. and Sentry Select Insurance Company as subrogee of Precision Inc. doing business as Precision Boats
Defendant: John Does I-X
Case Number: 4:2021cv00496
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - The Stipulation of Confidentiality and Protective Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Ruchti, James)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
February 15, 2022 NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Jacob S. Wessel wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Wessel, Jacob)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc..(Cooper, Gary)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (COMPLEX TRACK) - IT IS SO ORDERED that telephonic schedulingconference on January 31, 2022 is VACATED. All dispositive motions shall be filed by May 12, 2023. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before May 2, 2022. ADR must be held by April 28, 2023. All factual discovery will be completed by April 12, 2023. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
January 24, 2022 Filing 15 DISCOVERY PLAN by Sentry Select Insurance Company . (Ruchti, James)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Ruchti, James)
January 3, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skier's Choice, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Parrel Holdings, Inc. for Skier's Choice, Inc. (Ritchie, Benjamin)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc.. (Cooper, Gary)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 and #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Edmund Perry and Thomas J. Underwood, Jr for Sentry Select Insurance Company Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Edmund Perry. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2321344.)James D Ruchti appearing for Plaintiff Sentry Select Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ruchti, James)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Underwood, Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2321341.)James D Ruchti appearing for Plaintiff Sentry Select Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ruchti, James)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Ruchti, James)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indmar Products Co., Inc.. (Kraft, Steven)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Ruchti, James)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Indmar Products Co., Inc..(Kraft, Steven)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before January 24, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc., Indmar Products Co., Inc., Sentry Select Insurance Company and for Skier's Choice, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/14/2022. (jd)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Supplement Docket Sheet, #3 Supplement Notice of Appearance, #4 Supplement Affidavit of Service Arrowhead Engineered Products, #5 Supplement Affidavit of Service Skier's Choice, #6 Supplement Affidavit of Service Indmar Products, #7 Supplement Defendant Skier's Choice's Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #8 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment)(Cooper, Gary)
December 16, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal was filed incorrectly in this case. The State Court documents should be attachments to the Petition for Removal. Each one should be a separate attachment.Example:Your Main Document will be the Petition for Removal. State Court documents should be attached as: Attachment 1) Complaint Attachment 2) State Court Docket Attachment 3) Service Documents Attachment 4) Any answers Attachment 5) Pending Motions. Please refile your state court documents ONLY, using the ECF event "Supplement" and link them to the petition for removal dkt. 1. Please also file a civil cover sheet, form JS44 using the ECF event "Civil Cover Sheet". (jd)
December 16, 2021 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) Answer was filed at the state court by Skier's choice, Inc. on 12/13/21. (jd)
December 16, 2021 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Bonneville, case number CV10-21-6208.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2317072.), filed by All Defendants.(Cooper, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentry Select Insurance Company v. Skiers Choice, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company as subrogee of Precision, Inc dba Preision Boats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Boats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skier's Choice, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indmar Products Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowhead Engineered Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company as subrogee of Precision Inc. doing business as Precision Boats
Represented By: Edmund Perry
Represented By: James D Ruchti
Represented By: Thomas J. Underwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?