Gordon v. Nicoll
Plaintiff: Paula L Gordon
Defendant: Vikk D Nicoll
3Rd Party Defendant: Specialty Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv00235
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed.(km). Modified on 7/29/2022 (km).
July 29, 2022 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 7 . Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1, consents should not be filed on the docket. The Clerk will remove the document and correct the docket entry. No further action from the filing party is required. (km)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand filed by Paula L Gordon.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2022.(Banks, Jeffery)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION filed by Vikk D Nicoll. Replies due by 7/21/2022.(Olsen, Nathan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Corporation. (Banks, Jeffery)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand Jeffery Wayne Banks appearing for Plaintiff Paula L Gordon, Counter Defendant Paula L Gordon, ThirdParty Defendant Specialty Corporation. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Banks, Jeffery)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Paula L Gordon, Vikk D Nicoll, Specialty Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/2/2022. (jd)
June 3, 2022 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Vikk D Nicoll served on 6/2/2022. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
June 3, 2022 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vikk D Nicoll from Seventh Judicial District Court of the State of Idaho, Butte County, case number CV12-22-0006.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2402993.), filed by Vikk D Nicoll. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Another Summons, #4 Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim, #5 Reply to Counterclaim, #6 Court Minutes, #7 State Court Docket Sheet)(Olsen, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula L Gordon
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikk D Nicoll
Represented By: Nathan M Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Specialty Corporation
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?