Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C. v. Zoetis Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.
Defendant: Zoetis Inc. and Zoetis US LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00530
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/24/2023.(McLaughlin, Alexander)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.. Replies due by 2/23/2023.(Williams, Daniel)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #11 , #12 Stipulation to Extend Briefing and Pretrial Deadlines and Stay Discovery. Having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause, the Court hereby orders that Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due February 9, 2023. Defendant's Reply is due February 23, 2023. The Court further orders that the deadlines set forth in #5 the Court's Litigation Order are hereby stayed. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for February 27, 2023, At 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. Once Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is resolved, the Court will issue an amended Litigation Order with new deadlines. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing and Pretrial Deadlines and Stay Discovery by Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.. (Williams, Daniel)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing and Pretrial Deadlines and Stay Discovery by Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.. (Williams, Daniel)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkts. #7 , #8 & #9 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Joseph H Blum,Sean P Wajert,Gabrielle P Kelerchian for Zoetis Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Gabrielle P. Kelerchian. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2508903.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sean P. Wajert. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2508902.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Joseph Blum. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2508781.)Alexander P. McLaughlin appearing for Defendants Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2023 (McLaughlin, Alexander)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C. identifying Other Affiliate PMTB Investments, L.L.C. for Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.. (Williams, Daniel)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2023 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr.. On or before Tuesday, February 21, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC identifying Other Affiliate Zoetis Holdings LLC for Zoetis US LLC. (McQuade, Melodie)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Melodie Annalise McQuade appearing for Defendants Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(McQuade, Melodie)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C., Zoetis Inc., Zoetis US LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/6/2023. (lm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge Patricco. Please use case number 4:22-cv-00530-REP for all future filings. Notice of reassignment was emailed to Amy Beers
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Zoetis Inc. served on 12/30/2022; Zoetis US LLC served on 12/30/2022. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial District Court, State of Idaho, Cassia County, case number CV16-22-00982.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2498543.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Summons Exhibit B - Summons (Zoetis Inc.), #3 Summons Exhibit C - Summons (Zoetis US), #4 State Court Service Documents Exhibit D - Declaration of Service (Zoetis Inc.), #5 State Court Service Documents Exhibit E - Declaration of Service (Zoetis US), #6 Exhibit F - Register of Actions, #7 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C. v. Zoetis Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albion Ranch 2006, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel E. Williams
Represented By: Kelly C. Stevenson
Represented By: William A. Fuhrman
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoetis Inc.
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Represented By: Gabrielle P Kelerchian
Represented By: Joseph H Blum
Represented By: Sean P Wajert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoetis US LLC
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Represented By: Gabrielle P Kelerchian
Represented By: Joseph H Blum
Represented By: Sean P Wajert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?