State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Corporation and Samsung Electronics America, INC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00030
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal Re: Defendant Samsung Corporation by Samsung Corporation. (Zener, Jeremy)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER - All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by December 20, 2023. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before June 20, 2023. ADR must be held by November 3, 2023. All fact discovery must be completed by November 20, 2023. The Court will conduct a status conference with the parties on November 14, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
March 9, 2023 Filing 17 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Reinert, Christine)
March 9, 2023 Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company . (Reinert, Christine)
March 8, 2023 Filing 15 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
March 8, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Jeremy M Zener for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. added. Attorney Kelsey L Shewbert terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Zener, Jeremy)
March 8, 2023 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #13 Notice (Other) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. (lm)
March 7, 2023 Filing 13 DISREGARD Modified on 3/8/2023 (lm).
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, INC.(Zener, Jeremy)
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Shewbert, Kelsey)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Samsung Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, INC re #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/11/2023. (lm)
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M Zener on behalf of Samsung Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, INC (Zener, Jeremy)
January 26, 2023 Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on March 20, 2023, at 11:30 AM. On or before March 13, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 24, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Reinert, Christine)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lm)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT added Samsung Electronics America, Inc. against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Corporation, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Reinert, Christine)
January 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 3/21/2023. (lm)
January 19, 2023 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 1/19/2023; Samsung Corporation served on 1/19/2023. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International Inc for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Shewbert, Kelsey)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kelsey L. Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. . (Shewbert, Kelsey)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Bannock County, case number CV03-22-04128.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2508006.), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Register of Actions, #4 Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet)(Shewbert, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Reinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey L Shewbert
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, INC
Represented By: Jeremy M Zener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?