Byers, et al. v. Bull, et al.
Plaintiff: David Byers, Darrell Byers, Dale Byers and Doyle Byers
Defendant: Larry Bull, D.A. Daivdson & Co., Thomas J. Holmes and Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA
Case Number: 4:2023cv00494
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Defendant D.A. Davidson & Co. has represented that Plaintiffs no longer intend to pursue default judgment against it. Accordingly, the Court will deem Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment [Dkt. 9] MOOT unless Plaintiffs notify the Court by December 29, 2023 that they intend to pursue the Motion. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ec)
December 22, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re. dkt #21 Notice to Pro Se Litigants re E-Government Act. (ac)
December 22, 2023 Filing 22 PLEASE DISREGARD-See corrective entry. NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of Civil Rule 5.5 Protection of Personal Privacy in Regard to E-Government Act of 2002 sent to Plaintiffs re #21 NOTICE by D.A. Daivdson & Co. re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default of Defendant D.A. Davidson & Co., #10 Answer to Complaint (Hesse, Christina) (ac) Modified on 12/22/2023 (ac).
December 22, 2023 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 22 Notice to Pro Se Litigants re E-Government Act, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please disregard. (ac)
December 21, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by D.A. Daivdson & Co. re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default of Defendant D.A. Davidson & Co., #10 Answer to Complaint (Hesse, Christina)
December 13, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.A. Daivdson & Co.. (Duke, Keely)
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Larry Bull re. dkt #16 Notice of Appearance, dkt. #18 Amended Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/6/2024. (ac)
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Larry Bull. (Palmer, Nathan)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA. (Perucca, Robby)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Wheeler Peterson on behalf of Larry Bull (Peterson, Kate)
December 5, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant Larry Bull's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Larry Bull.(Palmer, Nathan)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA, Thomas J. Holmes re. dkt. #13 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/5/2024. (ac)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 Defendants Holmes & Beard St. Clair's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury by Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA, Thomas J. Holmes.(Perucca, Robby)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Dale Byers, Darrell Byers, David Byers, Doyle Byers, D.A. Daivdson & Co. re. dkt. #1 Complaint, dkt. #11 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/2/2024. (ac)
December 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Mott Hesse on behalf of D.A. Daivdson & Co. (Hesse, Christina)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by D.A. Daivdson & Co..(Duke, Keely)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default of Defendant D.A. Davidson & Co. Doyle S. Byers appearing for Plaintiff Doyle Byers. Responses due by 12/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Doyle S. Byers In Supoort of Entry of Default)(Byers, Doyle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doyle Byers. Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023. (Byers, Doyle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doyle Byers. Thomas J. Holmes served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Byers, Doyle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doyle Byers. D.A. Daivdson & Co. served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (Byers, Doyle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doyle Byers. Larry Bull served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Byers, Doyle)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for ECF/PACER access. Dkt. #3 . Good cause appearing, the same is GRANTED. The Court will allow Plaintiffs to have an electronic filing ECF account in the District of Idaho. Plaintiffs shall contact the Clerk of the Court at 208-334-1361 to set up such access. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for ECF/PACER access by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jd)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for D.A. Davidson & Co., #2 Summons for Larry Bull, #3 Summons for Thomas Holmes)(jd)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jd)
November 8, 2023 RECEIPT: Check #27627 Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 400050022. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byers, et al. v. Bull, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle Byers
Represented By: Doyle S. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bull
Represented By: Kate Wheeler Peterson
Represented By: Nathan R Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.A. Daivdson & Co.
Represented By: Chesney Marie Arend
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Christina Mott Hesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Holmes
Represented By: Robby J. Perucca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard St. Clair Gaffney PA
Represented By: Robby J. Perucca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?