Tew v. Smith Roofing LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Thommas Tew
Defendant: Smith Roofing LLC, Crum & Foster Specialty and Old Republic Surety Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00048
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Smith Roofing LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/25/2024.(McFarlane, Paul)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Crum & Foster Specialty.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/21/2024.(Lether, Thomas)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Paul D. McFarlane appearing for Defendant Smith Roofing LLC. Responses due by 4/8/2024 (McFarlane, Paul)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Old Republic Surety Company.(Powers, Scott)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Scott C Powers appearing for Defendant Old Republic Surety Company. Responses due by 4/8/2024 (Powers, Scott)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Old Republic Surety Company Of Firm Name Change (Powers, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thommas Tew. Replies due by 3/22/2024.(jd)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum & Foster Specialty identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US), Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for Crum & Foster Specialty. (Lether, Thomas)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (jd)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Crum & Foster Specialty, Old Republic Surety Company re #7 Joinder and #8 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/3/2024. (jd)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Renee VanderHagen re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Crum & Foster Specialty . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lether, Thomas)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Thomas Lether appearing for Defendant Crum & Foster Specialty. Responses due by 3/22/2024 (Lether, Thomas)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crum & Foster Specialty, Old Republic Surety Company, Smith Roofing LLC, filed by Thommas Tew.(hs)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lether on behalf of Crum & Foster Specialty (Lether, Thomas)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINDER by Defendant Old Republic Surety Company joining #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Powers, Scott)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jd)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Smith Roofing LLC, Thommas Tew re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/26/2024. (jd)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Paul D. McFarlane appearing for Defendant Smith Roofing LLC. Responses due by 3/15/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo ISO Motion)(McFarlane, Paul)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thommas Tew. Crum & Foster Specialty served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024; Old Republic Surety Company served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024; Smith Roofing LLC served on 2/2/2024, answer due 2/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(hs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2024: #3 Envelope) (hs).
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thommas Tew. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jd)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 405.00, receipt # 400050036. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tew v. Smith Roofing LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thommas Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Roofing LLC
Represented By: Jack Andrew Borton
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Paul D. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Foster Specialty
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Surety Company
Represented By: Scott C Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?