Casey v. Blue Knight Holdings, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Mandy Rose Casey
Defendant: Blue Knight Holdings, LLC, Blue Knight Security, LLC, Caribou County Idaho, Devin Tweedy and Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2024cv00210
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blue Knight Holdings, LLC, Blue Knight Security, LLC, Caribou County Idaho, Devin Tweedy. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(lm)
June 10, 2024 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 405.00, receipt # 400050069 Paid in Full (ch)
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry, #1 Complaint filed by Mandy Rose Casey. (Sasser, M)
April 24, 2024 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 - 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Mandy Rose Casey was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their filing that has the Basis of Jurisdiction filled out and also this form must be signed by the filer. Please use the event Civil Events- Other Filings- Other Document and select Civil Cover Sheet. (lm)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis M Anthony Sasser appearing for Plaintiff Mandy Rose Casey. Responses due by 5/14/2024 (Sasser, M)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by Mandy Rose Casey. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit Affidavit for Fee Waiver)(Sasser, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Blue Knight Holdings, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Rose Casey
Represented By: M Anthony Sasser
Represented By: Angela C Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Knight Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Knight Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribou County Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Tweedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?