Williams v. Warden, Dixon Correctional Center
Petitioner: Glenn Williams
Respondent: Warden, Dixon Correctional Center
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv01364
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/18/2019. On 12/16/2019, Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #11 was forwarded to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals; the Motion will be resolved in Petitioner's case before that Court. The Clerk is therefore directed to terminate the Motion for Appointment of Counsel #11 appearing on this Docket. (EWL, ilcd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE re #6 Notice of Appeal. (JS, ilcd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/13/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. #10 ) is DENIED, the Court CERTIFIES the appeal was not taken in good faith, and Petitioner's Motion for Production of Record on Appeal (Doc. #12 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(4), the Clerk is directed to immediately notify the parties and the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals that this Court has denied Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and has certified his appeal is not taken in good faith because it is frivolous. The Clerk is also directed to forward Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel (Doc. #11 ) to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn Williams. USCA Case Number 19-3415. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Production of Record on Appeal by Petitioner Glenn Williams. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Glenn Williams. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Glenn Williams. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Glenn Williams re #6 Notice of Appeal. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability by Glenn Williams. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT by Glenn Williams re #6 Notice of Appeal. (JS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241 & 2254) by Glenn Williams. (JS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (JS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/26/2019. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 (Doc. #1 ) is summarily DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (JS, ilcd)
November 21, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626035742. (JS, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Glenn Williams. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (JS, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Glenn Williams. (JS, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Glenn Williams.(JS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Warden, Dixon Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Dixon Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?