James Jr v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Jesse James Jr
Defendant: Leonta Jackson, Wexford Corporation, Nikki Rambo, Andrew Tilden, Allison B., Cox, Marissa Hansen, Wexford Health Sources Inc and Allison B
Case Number: 1:2021cv01135
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re #19 MOTION to Dismiss sent electronically via Pontiac CC scanning program to Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. (ME)
June 15, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Marissa Hansen, Andrew Tilden, Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Taylor, Bradley)
June 15, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Marissa Hansen, Andrew Tilden, Wexford Health Sources Inc. Responses due by 6/29/2021 (Taylor, Bradley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 Remark: Copy of docket to be provided to Plaintiff. (KB)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case Pending in Central District of Illinois (Taylor, Bradley)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/11/2021. Plaintiff's "motions of pleading" appear to be requests for intervention to ensure Plaintiff's access to the prison law library and the scanner. The motions are denied #14 , #15 , with leave to renew after Defendants have been served and discovery begins. Before renewing the motions, Plaintiff should file a grievance seeking library access and receive a response from the grievance officer. Plaintiff's motion to confirm receipt of documents is granted. #11 The documents appear to have been received. To the extent Plaintiff seeks copies of documents he has filed, Plaintiff must send 10 cents per page, paid up front. The complaint and exhibits appear to number 143 pages, which would be $14.30. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. (KB)
June 10, 2021 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Jesse James Jr. (MJC)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bradley James Taylor on behalf of Marissa Hansen, Andrew Tilden, Wexford Health Sources Inc (Taylor, Bradley)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Jesse James Jr. (MJC)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Copy of 4/30/21 Filings by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. (Document titled "Motion of Pleading to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins".) Responses due by 6/21/2021. (MJC)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. (Document titled "Motion of Pleading to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins".) Responses due by 6/21/2021. (MJC)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse James Jr. Wexford Health Sources Inc waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (KB)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 5/24/2021. Plaintiff's letter to the Court has been docketed as a motion to confirm receipt of exhibits. The Court appears to have received the exhibits, which are docketed at entry 11. (KB)
May 24, 2021 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 5/24/2021, in the amount of $ 1.27; receipt number 446326003876 (ANW)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Allison B, Andrew Tilden, Cox, Leonta Jackson, Marissa Hansen, Nikki Rambo, and Wexford Corporation on 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Andrew Tilden, #2 Cox, #3 Leonta Jackson, #4 Marissa Hansen, #5 Nikki Rambo, #6 Wexford Corporation)(KB)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/20/2021. (KB)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/20/2021. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1) Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs. This case proceeds solely on the claims identified in this paragraph. 2) This case is now in the process of service. 3) Plaintiff's motion for the Court to appoint counsel is denied (5). 4) Plaintiff's motion to file exhibits is granted. #7 5) Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction is denied. #6 The clerk is directed to enter the standard order granting Plaintiff's in forma pauperis petition and assessing an initial partial filing fee, if not already done, and to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the standard procedures. 6) The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (KB)
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Confirm Receipt of Exhibits and TRO Motion by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. Responses due by 6/2/2021. (MJC)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Include Exhibits by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. Responses due by 5/28/2021 (ME)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed in Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. Responses due by 5/28/2021 (ME)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/5/21 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.27. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. (Prisoner Prepayment due by 6/4/2021). (KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jesse James Jr. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jesse James Jr (KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jesse James Jr.(KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KB)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesse James Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits, #3 Letter - Summons to Defendants)(KB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Jr v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tilden
Represented By: Bradley James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Hansen
Represented By: Bradley James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc
Represented By: Bradley James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse James Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?