Hill v. Warden, FCI Pekin
Plaintiff: Nicki Lee Hill
Defendant: Warden, FCI Pekin
Case Number: 1:2021cv01220
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/20/2021. The Court GRANTS Petitioners Motion for Extension of Time #6 for good cause as stated in the Motion. Petitioners reply brief is now due on or before November 29, 2021. (RES)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Petitioner Nicki Lee Hill. Responses due by 10/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(RES)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Appendix re #4 Response to Motion (Appendix to Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) by Warden, FCI Pekin. (Simpson, W.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Warden, FCI Pekin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn Lyons, #2 Declaration of Kara Kerby)(Simpson, W.)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/24/2021. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(RES)
August 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 44626003919 (RES)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/17/2021. Petitioner has filed a Motion to Appoint Counsel #2 . A district court may appoint counsel to any financially eligible person seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241 if the interests of justice so require. 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). When confronted with a motion to appoint counsel, the court should ask whether the Petitioner has made efforts to obtain counsel and whether the Petitioner appears competent to litigate the case herself. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654 (7th Cir. 2007). Here, Petitioner has not shown that she has made any efforts to obtain counsel. The Court also finds that Petitioner has adequately presented her claim and appears competent to litigate the case herself. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Petitioners motion #2 without prejudice to refile later. Petitioners Motion also appears to be seeking a waiver of the $5 filing fee. However, Petitioner states that she has $30 in her institutional accounts. Accordingly, the Court finds that Petitioner has sufficient funds to pay the $5 fee. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5 filing fee on or before September 17, 2021, or her case will be dismissed without prejudice.(RES)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Nicki Lee Hill. Responses due by 8/30/2021 (RES)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicki Lee Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(RES)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/9/2021. Petitioner Hill has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 #1 but has not paid the associated $5 filing fee. Petitioner is DIRECTED to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before September 10, 2021, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (RES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Warden, FCI Pekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicki Lee Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, FCI Pekin
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?