Johnson v. Miles
Petitioner: Mark Johnson
Respondent: . Miles
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv02058
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/8/19. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #9 is DENIED. Petitioner is allowed 30 days to pay the $5.00 filing fee. See written Order. (Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/8/19.) (TC, ilcd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00588. .
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois at Urbana, Illinois the electronic record. (sxb, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois at Urbana, Illinois for preliminary consideration pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The Clerk is instructed to close this case number on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/7/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Johnson And Affidavit to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees Or Costs.(Exhibits) (nsf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #1 Trust Fund Ledgers) (KM, ilcd). (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/8/2019) (KM, ilcd).
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Johnson for attorney representation. (nsf, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mark Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (nsf, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/8/2019) (KM, ilcd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #1 Trust Fund Ledgers) (KM, ilcd).
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Mark Johnson dated 2/7/19.(Envelope post marked 2/8/2019) (nsf, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Johnson for attorney representation. (jh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mark Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing by Mark Johnson re PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Mark Johnson #1 . (jh, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Mark Johnson. (Exhibits) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: . Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?