Pitts v. Downey et al
Plaintiff: Jacob P Pitts
Defendant: Todd Schloendof, Jeremy Most, Chad Kolitwenzew, Michael Downey and . Love
Case Number: 2:2019cv02283
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/16/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is MOOT. (KE, ilcd)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (KE, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/2/2019. On October 30, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed in this case in forma pauperis. Upon further review, however, the Court has noticed that Plaintiff did not submit the second page of this form petition, and therefore, he has not verified, under the penalty for perjury, that the information that he has presented in support of his IFP petition is true and correct. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send another IFP form to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete this form, including the signature page and all other pages, and to re-file it with the Court. Plaintiff should file his amended IFP petition within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. (KE, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Michael Downey, Chad Kolitwenzew, Todd Schloendof and Sgt Love on 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Kolitwenzew, #2 Waiver Love, #3 Waiver Schloendof)(KE, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/25/2019. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 MERIT REVIEW OPINION entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/25/2019. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the court finds that the Plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment Due Process claim against the named defendants based on the conditions of his confinement. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to attempt service on the defendants pursuant to the standard procedures. See written order. Rule 16 Deadline 1/24/2020. (KE, ilcd)
November 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 11/14/2019 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance of the plaintiff by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff may renew at a later date. Written Order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 1:58 PM.) (DS, ilcd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/14/2019 1:58:14 PM ]. File Size [ 768 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:36 ]. (admin).
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Downey, Chad Kolitwenzew,. Love, Todd Schloendof, filed by Jacob P Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/12/2019. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #13 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court will conduct a merit review of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint at the hearing scheduled for November 14, 2019. Based upon his Amended Complaint, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Jeremy Most as a Defendant because Plaintiff's Amended Complaint does not identify him as a Party Defendant. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to add Sergeant Love as a Defendant based upon the allegations contained in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (KE, ilcd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Jacob P Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(DS, ilcd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(DS, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Telephone WRIT issued for Jacob P Pitts on 11/14/2019 at 2:00 PM for a Merit Review Hearing before Judge Baker. (KE, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/1/2019. A merit review hearing is set for 11/14/2019 at 2:00 p.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (KE, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/30/2019 granting #2 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff`s trust fund ledgers indicate he has no funds to make an initial partial payment of the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(4), the initial partial filing fee is waived. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Jacob P Pitts. (DS, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of the Court in regards to the request for a copy of the Local Rules. (KE, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/28/2019. Plaintiff's motion for a free copy of the Local Rules #7 is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send the Court's standard letter regarding how to obtain a copy of the Court's Local Rules that it sends to anyone requesting a copy of the Local Rules to Plaintiff. (KE, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/28/2019. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #4 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a merit review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives a merit review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for a Copy of the Local Rules by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Jacob P Pitts. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Jacob P Pitts. (KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Jacob P Pitts.(KE, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jacob P Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Summons, #4 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Downey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schloendof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Kolitwenzew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob P Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?