Wadlow v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Heather Wadlow
Defendant: Jane Moskus, Brad Rogers, Michael Williams and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv02202
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
2 Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
3 Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Count 10 only by Heather Wadlow. (Wegg, Jessica)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Brad Rogers.(Higgerson, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Brad Rogers. (Higgerson, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brad Rogers. Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Higgerson, Christopher)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher L Higgerson on behalf of Brad Rogers (Higgerson, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jane Moskus, Brad Rogers, Michael Williams and returned to counsel for service. (KB, ilcd)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley for all further proceedings due to nature of the case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/17/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jessica Ann Wegg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wegg, Jessica)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jonathan Charles Little on behalf of Heather Wadlow (Little, Jonathan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3425342.), filed by Heather Wadlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Little, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadlow v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Moskus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Rogers
Represented By: Christopher L Higgerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Wadlow
Represented By: Jessica Ann Wegg
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?