Davis vs Wirco
Plaintiff: Milton Davis
Defendant: Wirco and Wirco Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv02279
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/21/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/23 at 10:00 AM, before Judge Eric I. Long, Courtroom B, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 7/24/23 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Eric I. Long, Courtroom B, Urbana. (TC)
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Consent to Magistrate Order UNREDACTED (SKR)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/20/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See Written Order. (SKR)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/16/2021. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #20 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 1/7/22, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 10/30/22, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 8/19/22, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 9/23/22, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 10/21/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 11/18/22, discovery closes 1/17/23, case dispositive motions due 2/28/23. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. A telephone status conference is set for 6/6/22 at 10:45 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(BMG)
December 15, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Wirco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Lena)
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Milton Davis. (Neiman, David)
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Neiman, David)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Neiman on behalf of Milton Davis (Neiman, David)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Wirco Inc. (Shapiro, Lena)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert J Shapiro, I on behalf of Wirco Inc (Shapiro, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel re #14 Notice of Appearance of Attorney, #2 Notice of Appearance of Attorney (Spingola, Peter)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter M Spingola on behalf of Wirco Inc (Spingola, Peter)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan E Shannon on behalf of Milton Davis (Shannon, Megan)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/17/21. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/17/21. Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #10 is GRANTED. Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 12/15/21. Defendants Motion for Refund of Duplicate Fees #11 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to refund Defendant the duplicate filing fee of $402. (SKR)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION Refund of Duplicate Fee re #3 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Wirco Inc. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Lena)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Wirco Inc. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Lena)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shapiro, Lena)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lena Shapiro on behalf of Wirco Inc (Shapiro, Lena)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ryan F Stephan on behalf of Milton Davis (Stephan, Ryan)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James B Zouras on behalf of Milton Davis (Zouras, James)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Removal, (Chapman, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert Andrew Chapman on behalf of Wirco (Chapman, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit, Champaign County, Illinois, case number 2021 L 000152 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3805261), filed by Wirco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Chapman, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert Andrew Chapman on behalf of Wirco (Chapman, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Champaign County, case number 2021L000152 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3805243), filed by Wirco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chapman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis vs Wirco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Davis
Represented By: David Neiman
Represented By: James B Zouras
Represented By: Megan E Shannon
Represented By: Miranda L Soucie
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirco
Represented By: Robert Andrew Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wirco Inc
Represented By: Lena Shapiro
Represented By: Peter M Spingola
Represented By: Robert J Shapiro
Represented By: Robert Andrew Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?